HI SB1078 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii Medical Board to summarily suspend a license and order a licensee to submit to a physical and mental examination under specific circumstances. Provides additional immunities that specify any person licensed by the Hawaii Medical Board who provides information indicating that another Board licensee may be guilty of unprofessional conduct or may be impaired because of drug or alcohol abuse or mental illness shall not be liable for any damages in any civil action based on the communication. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii Medical Board; Summary Suspension of a License; Physical and Mental Examination Order
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 214) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB847 (Same As) 2013-07-02 - Act 219, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1322).