HI SB1076 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Act 036, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Act 036, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires acupuncture applicants for the use of the doctor of acupuncture title to complete their doctoral studies from an institution recognized by the United States acupuncture accrediting body or from a foreign institution that is licensed, approved, or accredited by the applicable governmental authority in that respective foreign jurisdiction and also requires applicants for the use of the doctor of acupuncture title who complete their doctoral studies from a doctoral program at an educational institution in a foreign jurisdiction to have their doctoral education credentials evaluated by professional evaluators designated by the Board of Acupuncture.
Title
Acupuncturists; Doctor of Acupuncture Title
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Act 036, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136). |
2013-04-23 | House | Act 036, on 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 479). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1543), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6). |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1052), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-15-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 292). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 477) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB845 (Same As) 2013-02-05 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).