HI SB1075 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1075
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the pilot program for lease of public school land.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-16-17 3:05PM in conference room 224. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU/WTL, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1075 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
HB1286 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1286 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1075&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB1075_.HTM |