HI SB1072 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the Insurance Code by streamlining and improving the operations of the Insurance Division of the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs and ensuring that the Insurance Division retains its accreditation with the National Association of Insurance Commissioners. Effective July 1, 2112. (SB1072 HD1)
Title
Insurance; Insurance Code
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1024) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Carroll, Evans, C. Lee, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, Tsuji. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-13-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-13. |
2013-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-11-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 289) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 725) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 326) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB841 (Same As) 2013-06-26 - Act 190, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293).