HI SB1069 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1069
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit for taxpayers who install a helicopter noise-canceling technology system on a helicopter owned by the taxpayer and operated primarily within the State during the taxable year. Establishes a tour helicopter surcharge. Establishes a helicopter noise-canceling technology system special fund. (SB1069 HD1)
Title
Relating To Reduction Of Noise From Helicopter Operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 770). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Nakamura voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2179), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, B. Kobayashi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Nakamura; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1689) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Say; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Yamane. |
2019-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-21-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 360) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Moriwaki. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 748) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1069 (Carry Over) 2019-04-11 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
Subjects
Commercial Flights
Helicopters
Installation
Noise-Canceling Technology Systems
Special Fund
Surcharge
Tax Credit
Tours
Helicopters
Installation
Noise-Canceling Technology Systems
Special Fund
Surcharge
Tax Credit
Tours