HI SB1069 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1069
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public procurement construction bids to list subcontractors and joint contractors only for contracts of an unspecified dollar amount or more; provided that bids lacking this list may be accepted if in the State's best interest and subcontractor and joint contractor work is an unspecified per cent or less of the total bid amount. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 307) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Tokuda. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee on GVO has rescheduled its decision making to 02-09-17 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-09-17 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1069 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.