HI SB1065 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1065
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-31 - Re-Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-31 - Re-Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies, in the State Water Code, that fire safety use is a beneficial use of fresh water. Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources, in consultation with the Hawaii Emergency Management Agency, to cooperate with the counties and reservoir owners to develop protocols and agreements for the use of reservoir waters for fire safety purposes.
Title
Relating To Water.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1065 (Carry Over) 2023-01-31 - Re-Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM.
HB772 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB772 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1065&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB1065_.HTM |