HI SB1063 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1063

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Aerospace Advisory Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Aerospace Advisory Committee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-04SenateRe-Referred to EET, WAM.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to EET, JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB909 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1063 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to EET, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback