HI SB1046 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support the Hawaii Quentin Burdick rural health interdisciplinary training program. (SB1046 HD1)
Title
Health Professional Education; Workforce Development; Rural Areas; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 11:30am in conference room 329. | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-09 11:30am in conference room 329. | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-09 3:00 PM in conference room 329. | |
2009-04-22 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-09 2:00pm in conference room 329. | |
2009-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-09 2:00 PM in conference room 329. | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Re-referred to HED, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 58 | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Chang, Yamane, M. Lee Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Ching. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 650). | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Ige, Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); Hemmings. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 503). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Morita, Takai excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-2009. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1664) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2009-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-01-09 12:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Re-referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 42 | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Chang, Luke, Mizuno, Saiki, Souki, Takai, Thielen excused (7). | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1019), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Nakashima, Berg, Bertram, Hanohano, Rhoads, Saiki, Shimabukuro, Takumi, Yamane, Ching, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Manahan. | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-17-09 2:15 PM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to HED, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 283) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 797) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Hee, Hooser, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Galuteria, Kidani, Kokubun. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-09 9:00am in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) Reported from HRE/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 34) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Sakamoto, Baker, Kokubun, Takamine, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE-HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-09 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) Re-Referred to HRE/HTH, WAM. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |