HI SB1025 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - (H) Act 187, on 7/5/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - (H) Act 187, on 7/5/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the assault of firefighters and water safety officers to the offense of assault in the second degree. Creates a class B felony for unauthorized entry in a dwelling based on occupant's age and incapacity. (CD1)
Title
HSAC Package; Penal Code; Firefighters; Water Safety Officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | (H) Act 187, on 7/5/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291). | |
2011-07-07 | (S) Act 187, 7/5/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 32) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 32). | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 3:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-11 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-11 2:45PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-25-11 2:45PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-11 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Aquino, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Cullen, Ichiyama, Kawakami, Fontaine. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 488). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1461) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Luke. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-29-11 3:30PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Chang, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2011-03-23 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-24-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-24-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1085), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souki. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 03-17-11 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to PBM, JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 230) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 475) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 10:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |