HI SB10 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Addresses the operational deficiencies of the sheriff division of the department of public safety that were highlighted in the auditor's audit of the division. Makes appropriation.
Title
Department of Public Safety; Sheriff's Division; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=10 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB10_.HTM |