HI HR97 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - (H) Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - (H) Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Assist Schools To Establish Walk + Bike School Bus Programs Statewide.
Title
DOE Assist Schools to Establish Walk + Bike School Bus Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Jon Karamatsu [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | (H) Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 57 | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting no and Bertram, Herkes, M. Lee, Mizuno excused. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1014-10), recommending referral to TRN. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-29-10 10:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-29-10 10:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Takumi, Berg, Bertram, Chang, Hanohano, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Shimabukuro, Takai, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Manahan, Yamane, Ching. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-17-10 2:05PM in conference room 309. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Referred to EDN, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 42 | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-04 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR159 (Same As) 2010-03-30 - (H) Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 57