HI HR93 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR93
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Adopt Administrative Rules Regarding The Kuleana Homestead Program.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Adopt Administrative Rules Regarding The Kuleana Homestead Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-03-21 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-24-17 11:20AM in conference room 312. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR93 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=93&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HR93_.HTM |