HI HR91 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR91
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Supply Each Public Kindergarten And Elementary School Student In The State With Meals, Ready-to-eat, For Consumption When Natural Disasters Or Other Emergency Incidents Occur.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Supply Each Public Kindergarten And Elementary School Student In The State With Meals, Ready-to-eat, For Consumption When Natural Disasters Or Other Emergency Incidents Occur.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2035-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-13 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ing, McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2018-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 04-13-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-20 | House | Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 44 |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to PBS/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Offered |
2018-03-08 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR105 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 44
HR91 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HR91 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=91&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR91_.HTM |