HI HR90 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR90
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly Urging The United States Congress To Pass Legislation To Clarify The Status Of Migrants Under The Compacts Of Free Association For Purposes Of The Real Id Act Of 2005 To Promote Fairness And Equality Under The Law.
Title
Strongly Urging The United States Congress To Pass Legislation To Clarify The Status Of Migrants Under The Compacts Of Free Association For Purposes Of The Real Id Act Of 2005 To Promote Fairness And Equality Under The Law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1682-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-23 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ito, Tokioka, Ward. |
2018-03-22 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by VMI on Friday, 03-23-18 10:15AM in conference room 429. |
2018-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Friday, 03-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 429. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Offered |
2018-03-08 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR104 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HR90 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 30
HR90 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 30