HI HR86 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The United States Congress To Enact Legislation Removing Cannabis From The Federal Controlled Substances Act And Facilitate The Full Spectrum Of Private Banking Services For Cannabis-related Business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The United States Congress To Enact Legislation Removing Cannabis From The Federal Controlled Substances Act And Facilitate The Full Spectrum Of Private Banking Services For Cannabis-related Business.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-01HouseAdopted with Representative(s) Kitagawa voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Eli, Har, Kong, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting no (11) and Representative(s) Holt, McKelvey, Quinlan, Saiki, Todd excused (5).
2019-04-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1925), recommending adoption.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Yamane.
2019-03-20HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:10PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HCR89 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback