HI HR8 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Legislature To Address The Concerns Raised At The Twenty-seventh Children And Youth Summit And Advance Pathways For The Betterment Of The Homeless In The State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Legislature To Address The Concerns Raised At The Twenty-seventh Children And Youth Summit And Advance Pathways For The Betterment Of The Homeless In The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-24HouseReported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1282) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA.
2021-03-23HouseThe committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
2021-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18HouseReferred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 15
2021-01-25HouseOffered
2021-01-22HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR7 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback