HI HR79 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - Referred to EEP, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - Referred to EEP, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renewing The State Of Hawaii's Commitment To Clean Energy By Implementing Hydrogen-based Energy Infrastructure Throughout The State.
Title
Encouraging the Implementation of Hydrogen Energy Infrastructure to Reflect Hawaii's Commitment to Clean Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to EEP, referral sheet 32 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
2014-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR106 (Same As) 2014-04-08 - Referred to ENE/EGH, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=79&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HR79_.HTM |