HI HR72 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR72
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Undertake Beach Nourishment From Laniakea Beach To Velzyland Beach On The North Shore Of Oahu.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Undertake Beach Nourishment From Laniakea Beach To Velzyland Beach On The North Shore Of Oahu.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
2022-03-10 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR81 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 27
HR72 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR72 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=72&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HR72_.HTM |