HI HR68 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR68
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress, Federal Aviation Administration, And Hawaii Department Of Transportation To Take Every Action Necessary To Address Rapidly Increasing Safety Risks And Community Disruption Resulting From Insufficient Regulation Of Rapidly Increasing Operations Of Tour Helicopters And Small Aircraft Throughout Hawaii Skies.
Title
Urging The United States Congress, Federal Aviation Administration, And Hawaii Department Of Transportation To Take Every Action Necessary To Address Rapidly Increasing Safety Risks And Community Disruption Resulting From Insufficient Regulation Of Rapidly Increasing Operations Of Tour Helicopters And Small Aircraft Throughout Hawaii Skies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1597) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2021-03-29 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi. |
2021-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1155), recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-03-19 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-19-21 10:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-11 | House | Offered |
2021-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR68 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR81 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR81 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Congress
Federal Aviation Administration
Hawaii Department of Transportation
Regulation
Safety
Small Aircraft
Tour Helicopters
Federal Aviation Administration
Hawaii Department of Transportation
Regulation
Safety
Small Aircraft
Tour Helicopters