HI HR61 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging State Departments And Agencies To Enable Employees To Telework To The Greatest Extent Possible.
Title
Urging State Departments And Agencies To Enable Employees To Telework To The Greatest Extent Possible.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1738-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2024-03-28 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1486-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Sayama, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Martinez, Alcos. |
2024-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 03-21-24 10:00AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2024-03-07 | House | Offered |
2024-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR76 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to GVO.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=61&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HR61_.HTM |