HI HR61 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Climate Change And Health Working Group To Assess The Scope And Risks Of Climate Change On The Health Of Hawaii's Residents And To Develop A Strategic Plan To Address Climate Change Risks To Health Statewide.
Title
Climate Change and Health Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1437), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:15PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1060), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-23 | House | Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2015-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-20-15 8:45AM in conference room 329. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to HLT, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
2015-03-12 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR108 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=61&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HR61_.HTM |