HI HR49 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR49
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Develop And Implement A Plan To Reduce The Use Of External Contracts For Curricula, Instruction, And Testing In Public Schools.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Develop And Implement A Plan To Reduce The Use Of External Contracts For Curricula, Instruction, And Testing In Public Schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1120) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-11 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2021-03-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-11-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 & 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 19 |
2021-03-04 | House | Offered |
2021-03-01 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR49 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
HCR60 (Same As) 2021-03-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
HCR60 (Same As) 2021-03-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Subjects
Acellus Learning Accelerator
Board of Education
Curricula
Department of Education
External Contracts
Instruction
Testing
Board of Education
Curricula
Department of Education
External Contracts
Instruction
Testing