HI HR42 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR42
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Examine Wwoofing In Hawaii, Review Relevant Hawaii Labor Laws, And Make Recommendations.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Examine Wwoofing In Hawaii, Review Relevant Hawaii Labor Laws, And Make Recommendations.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-04-17 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6). |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1805), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Morikawa, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen. |
2017-04-10 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-12-17 2:45PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-12-17 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1412) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. |
2017-03-24 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen. |
2017-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-24-17 8:31AM in conference room 312. |
2017-03-20 | House | Re-referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR/LAB, JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Offered |
2017-03-03 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR42 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR76 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HCR76 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).