HI HR41 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR41
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii State Energy Office To Engage The United States Department Of Energy To Establish A Permanent Presence Within The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii State Energy Office To Engage The United States Department Of Energy To Establish A Permanent Presence Within The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3). |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1750-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har, Hashem. |
2022-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1570-22), recommending referral to CPC. |
2022-03-24 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-24-22 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-10 | House | Offered |
2022-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR46 (Same As) 2022-04-12 - Referred to EET/PSM.
HR41 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
HR41 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).