HI HR32 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR32

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The State To Include In Its List Of First Responders A Network Of Organizations Contracted To Immediately Provide Food, Beverages, And Ice To Citizens During A Natural Disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The State To Include In Its List Of First Responders A Network Of Organizations Contracted To Immediately Provide Food, Beverages, And Ice To Citizens During A Natural Disaster.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-03-28HouseReported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1544-18), recommending referral to FIN.
2018-03-22HouseThe committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
2018-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-22-18 10:30AM in conference room 312.
2018-03-13HouseReferred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 39
2018-03-01HouseOffered
2018-02-26HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR32 (Carry Over) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR44 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback