HI HR227 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Release Or Restore Funds To The Department Of Human Services For Early Education Program For The Homeless Children On The Leeward Coast Of Oahu.
Title
Department of Human Services; Homeless Programs; Partners in Development Foundation
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll excused. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reported from HUS/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1359) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Chang, Coffman, Nakashima, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Herkes, Ito, Thielen. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS/HSG on Monday, 03-28-11 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to HUS/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR265 (Same As) 2011-04-05 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll excused.