HI HR217 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations And The Department Of Human Services To Continue To Engage In Data Exchanges In Order To Verify The Eligibility Of Recipients Of Medicaid Assistance.
Title
Medicaid
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1703), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Har, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:30AM in conference room 308. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll excused. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reported from HUS/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1357) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Souki, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Saiki, Takumi. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS/LAB on Monday, 03-28-11 10:15AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to HUS/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR254 (Same As) 2011-04-19 - (S) Referred to HMS/JDL.