HI HR202 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Office Of Veterans' Services Of The Department Of Defense To Include A Section Dedicated To Veterans Of The Conflicts In Iraq And Afghanistan In The Hawaii State Veterans Cemetery And Allow For Photos And Other Memorial Objects Of Veterans To Be Placed At Gravesites In The Hawaii State Veterans Cemetery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans; Conflicts in Iraq and Afghanistan; Veterans Cemetery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
2010-03-22 (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 03-25-10 10:00AM in conference room 312.
2010-03-12 (H) Referred to EBM, FIN, referral sheet 48
2010-03-10 (H) Offered

Same As/Similar To

HCR280 (Same As) 2010-03-25 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback