HI HR201 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Comptroller Convene A Working Group To Review And Recommend Improvements To State Facilities To Maximize Health And Cognitive Function.
Title
Requesting That The Comptroller Convene A Working Group To Review And Recommend Improvements To State Facilities To Maximize Health And Cognitive Function.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2028), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt. |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-27 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4). |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1771) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2019-03-15 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:35AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR226 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.