HI HR200 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Departments Of Agriculture And Health To Evaluate California's Current And Pending Regulations On Chlorpyrifos And Make Recommendations For Implementation Of Similar Regulations In Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Departments Of Agriculture And Health To Evaluate California's Current And Pending Regulations On Chlorpyrifos And Make Recommendations For Implementation Of Similar Regulations In Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from EEP/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1539-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Ing. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Yamane. |
2018-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP/AGR on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:35AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR230 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=200&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR200_.HTM |