HI HR197 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on WLO as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, M. Oshiro excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on WLO as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, M. Oshiro excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Counties To Activate And Enforce Existing Ordinances As Well As Adopt Ordinances Identifying And Protecting Culturally Valuable Sites.
Title
Culturally Valuable Sites; County Legislation
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on WLO as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, M. Oshiro excused. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Deferred one day 04-27-11. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Reported from CUA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1751) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to WLO. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 04-01-11 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 04-01-11 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) The committees on CUA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by CUA on Monday, 03-28-11 11:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to CUA, WLO, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR226 (Same As) 2011-03-30 - (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 04-01-11 10:30AM in conference room 325.