HI HR172 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Counties To Amend Their Land Use Ordinances To Include Regulations To Reduce Storm Water Runoff On All New Buildings And Renovations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Counties To Amend Their Land Use Ordinances To Include Regulations To Reduce Storm Water Runoff On All New Buildings And Renovations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-03-28HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1583-18), recommending referral to FIN.
2018-03-23HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Kong, Lowen, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, C. Lee.
2018-03-20HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2018-03-13HouseReferred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39
2018-03-09HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HCR202 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback