HI HR172 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on ERB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Saiki, Ward, Wooley excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging The United States Department Of Defense To Procure Goods And Services That Are Used To Support Hawaii-based United States Military Personnel And Facilities From Hawaii Businesses And To Cooperate With The Chamber Of Commerce Of Hawaii To Host Trade Shows That Feature Local Businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement; Hawaii Businesses; Military

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-02 (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on ERB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Saiki, Ward, Wooley excused (4).
2012-04-02 (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1427-12), recommending referral to ERB.
2012-03-29 (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Souki, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takai, Takumi.
2012-03-27 (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 03-29-12 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2012-03-20 (H) Referred to PBM, ERB, referral sheet 50
2012-03-14 (H) Offered

Same As/Similar To

HCR223 (Same As) 2012-04-02 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on ERB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Saiki, Ward, Wooley excused (4).

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback