HI HR161 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR161
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii Board Of Regents To Continue To Support And Fund The Industrial Relations Center As A Valuable Labor-management Relations Resource For The Public And Private Sectors.
Title
Requesting The University Of Hawaii Board Of Regents To Continue To Support And Fund The Industrial Relations Center As A Valuable Labor-management Relations Resource For The Public And Private Sectors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2005), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt. |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6). |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported from LAB/LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1712), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite, Quinlan, Tokioka. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2019-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB/LHE on Monday, 03-18-19 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to LAB/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR161 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR179 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR179 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=161&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR161_.HTM |