HI HR160 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Develop Rules For Aquarium Fish Permitting That Protect Hawaii's Aquatic Wildlife And Reef Environments.
Title
RULES FOR AQUARIUM FISH PERMITTING THAT PROTECT HAWAII'S AQUATIC WILDLIFE AND REEF ENVIRONMENTS
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-23 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-25-15 at 9:00 am in conference room 325. |
2015-03-23 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-25-15 at 9:00 am in conference room 325. |
2015-03-20 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR229 (Same As) 2015-03-25 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.