HI HR158 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR158
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Include Mental Health Education For Students In Its Curriculum And Suicide Prevention As Part Of The In-service Training Of Teachers And Principals.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Include Mental Health Education For Students In Its Curriculum And Suicide Prevention As Part Of The In-service Training Of Teachers And Principals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1874), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Ward. |
2019-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-27-19 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-03-19 | House | Re-referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to LHE/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR158 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Department of Education
Graduation Course
Health
Mental Health
Principals
Students
Suicide Prevention
Teachers
Training
Graduation Course
Health
Mental Health
Principals
Students
Suicide Prevention
Teachers
Training
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=158&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR158_.HTM |