HI HR155 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR155
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The City And County Of Honolulu And Honolulu Police Department To Address The Ongoing Houselessness Crisis And Develop Solutions For Providing Care And Services For These Individuals While Ensuring Community Safety.
Title
Urging The City And County Of Honolulu And Honolulu Police Department To Address The Ongoing Houselessness Crisis And Develop Solutions For Providing Care And Services For These Individuals While Ensuring Community Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-03-30 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Perruso voting no (3) and Representative(s) Hashem, Holt, Ohno, Todd excused (4). |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1559-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-03-29 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-29-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to HHH, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR155 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Referred to HMS/PSM.
HR155 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HR155 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Subjects
City and County of Honolulu
Homeless Outreach
Homelessness
Honolulu Police Department
Three Strikes
Weed & Seed
Homeless Outreach
Homelessness
Honolulu Police Department
Three Strikes
Weed & Seed