HI HR150 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Director Of Human Resources Development To Equalize Transit Benefits And Subsidies For All State Employees Regardless Of Mode Of Transportation.
Title
Transportation Benefits; State Employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1269), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-27 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-27-15 10:10AM in conference room 309. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR215 (Same As) 2015-04-10 - Referred to JDL, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=150&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HR150_.HTM |