HI HR139 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Review On The Effect Of The Transfer From Medicaid To Plans On The Hawaii Health Connector For Non-eligible Medicaid Compact Of Free Association Residents.
Title
Medicaid; Hawaii Health Connector; Compact of Free Association migrants
Sponsors
Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1455), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:15PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1353), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-30 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Creagan, Har, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kawakami, Yamane. |
2015-03-27 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1044), recommending referral to CPC. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Thursday, 03-19-15 11:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to HUS/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR203 (Same As) 2015-04-10 - Referred to CPN, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=139&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HR139_.HTM |