HI HR125 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Human Services, Department Of Health, And Judiciary To Prioritize Ensuring That Contracts For Government Services Are Adequately Resourced To Cover The Costs Of Providing Those Services.
Title
Urging The Department Of Human Services, Department Of Health, And Judiciary To Prioritize Ensuring That Contracts For Government Services Are Adequately Resourced To Cover The Costs Of Providing Those Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Cory Chun [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1710-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2024-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR143 (Same As) 2024-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=125&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HR125_.HTM |