HI HR124 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education And The Hawaii High School Athletic Association To Examine The Feasibility Of Establishing Brazilian Jiu-jitsu As A Sanctioned Sport.
Title
Jiu jitsu; DOE and HHSAA sanctioned sport
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1419), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:15PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1300), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-25 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Kong. |
2015-03-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-23 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-25-15 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR190 (Same As) 2015-04-22 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=124&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HR124_.HTM |