HI HR117 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR117
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Convene An Interagency Enforcement Task Force To Combat Illegal Activities Related To The Construction And Operations Of "monster Homes" In The State.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Convene An Interagency Enforcement Task Force To Combat Illegal Activities Related To The Construction And Operations Of "monster Homes" In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6). |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1716) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-03-21 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott. |
2019-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-21-19 10:35AM in conference room 423. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR117 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR127 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR127 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.