HI HR114 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The President Of The United States And The United States Congress To Exempt Certain Coral Species In All Commercial Harbors In The State Of Hawaii From Reclassification Under A Proposed Federal Rule Change.
Title
Harbors
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1699) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2013-04-10 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-06 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 04-10-13 11:15AM in conference room 309. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR143 (Same As) 2013-04-30 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 756).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=114&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR114_.HTM |