HI HR109 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR109
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Report Its Current Usage And Plans For Future Usage Of Glyphosate And Glyphosate-containing Herbicides On And Around Department Of Education Properties, Including Schools And Playgrounds.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Report Its Current Usage And Plans For Future Usage Of Glyphosate And Glyphosate-containing Herbicides On And Around Department Of Education Properties, Including Schools And Playgrounds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1789), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-25 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Tokioka. |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR109 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR119 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR119 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=109&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR109_.HTM |