HI HR109 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education And The Department Of Education To Develop A Strategic Plan To Address Chronic Student Absenteeism.
Title
Chronic absenteeism; BOE and DOE develop a strategic plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1298) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Kong, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Tupola. |
2015-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 03-20-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR173 (Same As) 2015-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).