HI HR10 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund To Review Its Health Insurance Coverage For Retirees And Their Family Members.
Title
The Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund is requested to review their policies for retirees and its family members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1360-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har, Takumi, Tupola. |
2016-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-22-16 10:30AM in conference room 309. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2016-02-05 | House | Offered |
2016-02-04 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR38 (Same As) 2016-04-05 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=10&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HR10_.HTM |