HI HCR97 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-01 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-01 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Conduct A Study To Establish A Reliable Scientific Threshold And Testing Protocol For Determining Whether A Person Cannot Safely Operate A Motor Vehicle Due To Being Under The Influence Of Marijuana.
Title
Driving under the influence of marijuana. Testing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-03-30 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 04-01-16 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1409-16), recommending referral to HLT. |
2016-03-28 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Har, Johanson, San Buenaventura. |
2016-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-28-16 11:15AM in conference room 309. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to TRN, HLT, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
2016-03-10 | House | To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=97&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HCR97_.HTM |