HI HCR94 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR94
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Referred to HTH/TRS.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Referred to HTH/TRS.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Examine Issues And Barriers To Enforcement To Reduce Noise From Two-stroke Engines, Mopeds, And Small Off-road Engines.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Examine Issues And Barriers To Enforcement To Reduce Noise From Two-stroke Engines, Mopeds, And Small Off-road Engines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Referred to HTH/TRS. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 379). |
2022-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-01 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McKelvey, Ohno, Okimoto, Quinlan excused (5). |
2022-04-01 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1661-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2022-03-29 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-29-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to HHH, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR88 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR94 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 25
HCR94 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 25