HI HCR90 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to PSM/CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to PSM/CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Various Branches Of The United States Armed Services In The State Of Hawaii, In Cooperation With The Military Affairs Council Of The Chamber Of Commerce Of Hawaii, To Establish A Working Group To Assess The Feasibility Of A Consolidated Military Transition, Immersion, And Education Center.
Title
Joint Military Transition, Immersion, and Education Center
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPN/WAM. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 665). |
2013-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1685) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2013-04-03 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, McDermott. |
2013-04-01 | House | Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 47 |
2013-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 04-03-13 11:05AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to VMI, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2013-03-12 | House | Offered |
2013-03-11 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR72 (Same As) 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=90&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR90_.HTM |